Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law authorizing the prelitigation discovery of specified insurance coverage information relating to claims involving vehicle accidents applicable to claims involving any tort involving death or bodily injury; providing that an insurer is only required to provide a claimant with documentation of the applicable limits of coverage in a specified automobile insurance policy, homeowner's insurance policy, or renter's insurance policy; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448473/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448473/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {448473/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {448473/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judiciary Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   10-1101 through 10-1104, 10-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page