Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing the Maryland Mold Remediation Services Act to terminate on July 1, 2019, in accordance with provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law); and extending to July 1, 2019, the deadline for licensure under the Maryland Mold Remediation Services Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0115
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Economic Matters 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text - Chapter - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
(   8-707, 8-718 )
(   2008, 2011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page