Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $50,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Cambridge Lighthouse Foundation, Inc. for the acquisition of artifacts and replicas of artifacts and the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of artifact exhibits at the Choptank River Lighthouse Museum, located in Dorchester County; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0192
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2015 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 171). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 171 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page