Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person that obtains a specified permit from the State Highway Administration that authorizes a sidewalk to be closed or that does the work associated with the permit to post a notice at the work site stating the expected period during which the sidewalk will be closed and the contact information for the person to whom the permit was issued or by whom the work is done.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0118
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page