Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Feldman, Klausmeier, Middleton, Peters, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service and the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for the purpose of granting a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans, and surviving spouses of eligible veterans.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page