Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Eastern Shore - State Matching Funds for Land-Grant Institutions
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020, to include in the annual State operating budget a general fund appropriation at least equal to a certain amount to the University System of Maryland; requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to allocate certain funding to the University of Maryland Eastern Shore for a certain purpose; providing that the funding shall be in addition to certain base funding appropriated to the University of Maryland Eastern Shore; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1139 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - University of Maryland Eastern Shore - State Matching Funds for Land-Grant Institutions
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page