Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Sponsored by
Senators King and Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that real property owned by a nonprofit museum that is open to the public and does not charge an admission fee is not subject to a certain limitation concerning the exemption of certain charitable or educational properties from the property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-15)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Ways and Means 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page