Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing emergency medical services providers and law enforcement officers to report overdoses using a certain information technology platform with secure access; requiring the emergency medical services provider or law enforcement officer making a report to make an effort to make the report within 24 hours after responding to the incident; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the information reported be utilized for purposes of making decisions regarding the allocation of public health and educational resources; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0359
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457277/1
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {923220/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {653028/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Middleton, Feldman and Hershey)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {457277/1 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {457277/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Floor Amendment {923220/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Floor Amendment {653028/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {216284/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Middleton, Feldman and Hershey) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-516 )
(   13-3601, 13-3602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page