Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Hiring Preferences for Graduates of Public Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an appointing authority to apply a credit of one point on a selection test for specified positions in the State Personnel Management System for each degree successfully completed by an applicant at specified public institutions of higher education; requiring specified appointing authorities to develop a hiring preference that is equivalent to a specified credit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page