Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a specified amount may be contributed in each calendar year to an account for a disabled individual under the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program; providing that contributions to an ABLE account may not exceed a specified maximum amount; and requiring the Maryland 529 Board to adopt specified procedures to ensure that specified contributions to ABLE accounts do not exceed a specified maximum limit.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Text - Chapter - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
(   18-19C-01, 18-19C-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page