Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain employers employing certain interns a credit against the State income tax, which may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to certain limitations; requiring a certain employer to enter into a certain agreement with a certain higher education institution; providing that not more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; requiring a report by the Comptroller on utilization of the tax credit by July 1, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1358
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0522 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page