Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Edwards, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a person is not criminally or civilly liable for damage resulting from the forcible entry into a motor vehicle for the purpose of removing an animal from the vehicle under specified circumstances.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0270 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - Immunity
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page