Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum rate of the admissions and amusement tax that a county or municipal corporation may set for gross receipts that are also subject to the State sales and use tax; altering the rate of the sales and use tax; altering the percentage of gross receipts from vending machine sales to which the sales and use tax rate is applied; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0659 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
(   11-104, 11-301, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page