Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text - Chapter - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page