Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study of Retirement Plan Alternatives
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to examine potential retirement plan options that may be offered to employees as an alternative to specified defined benefit pension plans; requiring the study to include specified elements; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to report its findings and recommendations to the Joint Committee on Pensions on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0748
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century Workforce
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399936/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Study of Retirement Plan Alternatives
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century Workforce
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {399936/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Study of Retirement Plan Alternatives
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Appropriations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page