Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Ferguson, Lee, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law subjecting specified individuals convicted of specified felonies involving a controlled dangerous substance who apply for or receive temporary cash assistance or food stamps to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; repealing a specified provision of law making a specified individual ineligible for temporary cash assistance or food stamps for 1 year after conviction; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page