Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to ensure that the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program complies with a provision of the Insurance Article that prohibits a copayment or coinsurance requirement for a covered prescription drug or device that exceeds the retail price of the prescription drug or device.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-842 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page