Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Benson, DeGrange, Edwards, Hough, Klausmeier, Manno, Middleton, Ready, Salling, Smith, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0664
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0020 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted (44-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted (44-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Text - Chapter - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page