Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds in order to estimate the number of 4-year old children being served by publicly funded kindergarten programs by using the free and reduced price meal eligibility data; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding an implementation plan based on a specified report and to present its findings to the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education by September 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0516
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909038/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {833020/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (52-86)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-34)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {909038/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Floor Amendment {833020/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (52-86) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (105-34) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Text - Chapter - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page