Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Legalizing the 2019 edition of the Code of Public Local Laws of Washington County, being Article 22 of the Code of Public Local Laws of Maryland, published under the direction of the Board of County Commissioners of Washington County; and making provisions for the publication, sale, and distribution of the Code of Public Local Laws of Washington County.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page