Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an electric cooperative to construct, maintain, or operate or allow others to construct, maintain, or operate conducting or communications facilities for telecommunications and broadband Internet services along, on, under, or across various types of property; requiring an electric cooperative to give certain notice to certain property owners at least 60 days before constructing certain facilities in a certain electric easement or making capacity available for certain services in the electric easement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1357
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167677/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {167677/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {167677/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Economic Matters 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {433892/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text - Chapter - Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page