Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, in a specified manner, to appoint the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from specified lists; requiring the Governor, in a specified manner, to fill specified vacant seats on the Board from specified lists; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page