Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Mathias, Eckardt, and Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 30 days to 60 days, the period of time during which a local department of social services must complete an investigation of a report of abuse, neglect, self-neglect, or financial exploitation when the report does not indicate that an emergency exists.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text - Chapter - Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
(   14-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page