Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Kelley, Lee, Ramirez, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award to a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified actions seeking to remedy a violation of a specified Maryland constitutional right; authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and expenses to a prevailing defendant under specified circumstances; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0903
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0362 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948179/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (24-20)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {383322/1 (Senator Muse)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {383322/1 (Senator Muse)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868374/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868374/1
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {948179/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {948179/1 Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (24-20) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Muse) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Muse) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {383322/1 (Senator Muse) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Muse) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {383322/1 (Senator Muse) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {868374/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Muse) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {868374/1 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page