Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a correctional unit, with certain exceptions, from contracting with a private contractor or vendor for the ownership, operation, or management of State and local correctional and detention facilities; prohibiting a correctional unit from being reimbursed in an amount greater than a certain per diem rate under a certain detention agreement for the detention of certain persons; defining certain terms; making technical changes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   1-101, 1-202, 1-203, 2-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page