Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary Changes
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, DeGrange, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from making specified formulary changes during the plan year and the open enrollment period that precedes the plan year; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary Changes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary Changes
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-831 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page