Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government in Frederick County to use a specified process to remediate blighted property; requiring the owner of a blighted property, on notification from the appropriate unit of local government, to remediate the property's blighted condition in a specified manner; requiring the appropriate unit of local government to send a written notice to all lienholders of record; authorizing the appropriate unit of local government to grant an extension of the required time periods; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   14-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page