Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Voluntary Protection Program in the Division of Labor and Industry to encourage participating employers to have exemplary worker safety and health programs; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to recognize specified employers under the Program; requiring an employer who wishes to participate in the Program to submit a specified application; authorizing the Commissioner to perform specified evaluations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {177077/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Reassigned to Economic Matters 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Text - Chapter - Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Voluntary Protection Program
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page