Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland to examine the tax sale system to maximize resources, facilitate properties getting to productive use, and protect residents; requiring the Task Force to evaluate the impact of tax sales, how tax sales are conducted in each county, and tax sales to collect delinquent water charges and alternative methods of collecting delinquent water charges; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0659
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {229733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565262/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {229733/1 Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {565262/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text - Chapter - Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page