Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Nonpublic Schools - Programs for Students With Special Needs
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring specified nonpublic schools, in consultation with the State Department of Education, to develop and implement a program for students with special needs on or before July 1, 2018; and requiring the State Board of Education to adopt specified regulations.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Nonpublic Schools - Programs for Students With Special Needs
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-440 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page