Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public entities to provide community-based long-term services and supports to specified individuals; requiring the Department of Disabilities to adopt a comprehensive plan that includes a specific and reasonable time frame and that is funded from any source; requiring the Department to complete its comprehensive plan no later than a specified date; providing that public entities may not discriminate against individuals who require long-term services and supports by specified means; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-1001, 7-801, 7-801 through 7-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page