Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring parties to collective bargaining negotiations for teachers and other personnel in Washington County to make reasonable efforts to conclude negotiations in a timely manner; and requiring that, if parties are unable to conclude negotiations by a certain budget submission deadline, the terms and conditions of the most recent negotiated agreement shall remain in force and effect, and without change, for the next fiscal year.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of Negotiations
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-102, 6-408, 6-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page