Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified manufacturers of autonomous and connected (AV/CV) vehicles to establish a safe autonomous vehicle (SAVE) project authorizing the manufacturer to supervise the driving of AV/CV vehicles on highways in the State; requiring an AV/CV vehicle manufacturer to certify to the Motor Vehicle Administration that the AV/CV vehicles in its fleet under a SAVE project meet specified standards; establishing that an AV/CV vehicle may be driven on a highway only as part of a SAVE project; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   11-103.4, 11-103.5, 11-135, 13-101.1, 13-402, 13-939.3, 21-1130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page