Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Administrative Care Coordination Unit Program and the Public Health Emergency Preparedness and Response Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing for the purposes of the Programs; requiring the Department to develop and use specified formulas to allocate funding under the Programs; establishing a mandated minimum appropriation to increase funding for specified programs over specified established funding levels; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-149, 20-1801 through 20-1803 )
(   10-1101 through 10-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page