Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery Stores
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Madaleno, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the personal property tax imposed on personal property of a grocery store that completes eligible construction and is located in a certain healthy food priority area; requiring the governing body of Prince George's County to designate what constitutes a healthy food priority area for purposes of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery Stores
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {169635/1 Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery Stores
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page