Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to take action against a clinical professional counselor only if the Board discusses the proposed action with a Board member who is a licensed clinical professional counselor and who votes, either in the affirmative or negative, on the proposed action; repealing the requirement that the credit hours or educational requirements completed by certain applicants to be licensed by the Board be accredited by the American Art Therapy Association; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654538/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Licensure, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status - Revisions
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654538/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text - Chapter - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
(   17-205, 17-304.1, 17-304.2, 17-310, 17-501, 17-501.1, 17-503, 17-506, 17-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page