Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a stakeholder workgroup to develop certain implementation plans to improve efficiency, accountability, and outcomes of certain specialty behavioral health services; requiring the workgroup to include certain representatives; requiring that certain implementation plans include certain recommendations for a certain timeline and certain necessary steps to achieve certain outcomes; requiring the Secretary of Health to submit certain reports on or before certain dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page