Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible to receive supplemental prekindergarten State grants in fiscal years 2018 through 2020; making specified grants to Baltimore City Public Schools subject to Baltimore City providing specified local contributions; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to make specified disbursements; requiring a specified audit; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to develop a specified financial recovery plan; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Grant for Declining Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909739/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-7)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education - Grant for Declining Education Aid
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {909739/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-7) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Text - Chapter - Education - State Grants for Education Aid
(   5-202, 5-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page