Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Young, Zucker, Conway, Kasemeyer, Middleton, and Oaks
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Redesignating electronic voter registration agencies as automatic voter registration agencies; requiring automatic voter registration agencies to inform an applicant completing an applicable transaction that the applicant shall be registered to vote or shall have a voter registration record updated unless the applicant declines these services or is not eligible to register to vote; requiring automatic voter registration agencies to implement automatic voter registration by July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0152
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0938 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884232/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {433023/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {823027/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-46)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884232/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884232/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {433023/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {823027/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Ways and Means 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-46) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Text - Chapter - Secure and Accessible Registration Act
(   16-101, 3-203, 3-204.2, 3-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page