Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the charter or bylaws of a corporation from imposing liability on a specified stockholder for the attorney's fees or expenses of the corporation or any other party in connection with an internal corporate claim; authorizing the charter or bylaws of a corporation, consistent with jurisdictional requirements, to require that internal corporate claims be brought only in specified courts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-101, 1-203, 1-301, 2-113, 2-212, 2-514, 3-507, 3-515, 5-207, 8-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page