Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "specialty drug" for purposes of certain provisions of law governing access to specialty drugs through certain pharmacies so as to include a drug designated as a limited distribution drug, a drug that is not available in an oral or self-administered formulation, or a drug that requires special handling above and beyond refrigeration or patient counseling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - Definition
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-847, 15-847.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page