Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' Pension System - Membership - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Retirement Agency and the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a study regarding membership in the Employees' Pension System for individuals who are employed in a position for which the budgeted hours per fiscal year are less than 500 hours; requiring the study to include specified elements; requiring the State Retirement Agency and the Department to report their findings and recommendations to the Joint Committee on Pensions on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employees' Pension System - Incorrect Enrollments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Employees' Pension System - Membership - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Employees' Pension System - Incorrect Enrollments
Senate 2/23/2017 2/24/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {509132/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Employees' Pension System - Membership - Study
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page