Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Jennings, and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate the bridge located at the intersection of Maryland Route 22 and Interstate Highway 95 as the Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Reassigned to Finance 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Text - Chapter - State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page