Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending from 5 years to 20 years the length of time that student data and workforce data used by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System is limited to being linked beyond the date of latest attendance in any educational institution in the State; and prohibiting the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center from selling specified protected information; and prohibiting the Center from charging specified fees.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-39)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {134436/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (96-39) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
(   24-702, 24-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page