Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore County annually to spend, from the fines collected as a result of violations enforced by speed monitoring systems in school zones, up to $5,000 per public high school for after-prom parties.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring System Fines - After-Prom Parties
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page