Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Astle, Bates, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Peters, Robinson, Salling, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist dispensing a drug classified as an opioid to offer to sell or distribute to the recipient a certain nontoxic composition for the sequestration or deactivation of the drug and the disposal of any unused, unwanted, or expired portion of the prescription at certain times; and establishing that a certain provision of the Act does not relieve a person from certain requirements of law regarding controlled dangerous substances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0601
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {977276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Referred Senate Rules 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {977276/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58 Click to view Recorded Media
(   21-221.1, 21-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page