Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commitment to Education Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring money in the Education Trust Fund to be expended in a certain manner in certain fiscal years; requiring certain percentages of the money in the Education Trust Fund to be supplemental to funding for certain programs and formulas beginning in fiscal year 2020; and prohibiting the use of certain funds on school construction projects that the State has approved for planning and for which a local education agency has paid some portion of the State share with local funds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commitment to Education Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Jennings) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Senate Rules 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Commitment to Education Act of 2018
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-30 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page