Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Environment, Department Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0080
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0379
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517
Title
Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0028
Title
Environment - Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0080 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0012 /CH0379 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0517 Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0028 Environment - Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund - Use of Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page