Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Health And Mental Hygiene, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0469
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597
Title
Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0183
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0381
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1101 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 /CH0469 Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 Public Health - Immunizations - Related Institutions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0598 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 /CH0183 Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 /CH0381 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page