Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Department Of Information Technology

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0082
Title
Procurement Advisory Council - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123 /CH0137
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized Expenditures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0082 Procurement Advisory Council - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0123 /CH0137 Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized Expenditures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page